Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/10/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/10/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/19/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 04/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/24/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/27/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/11/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/02/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/12/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/15/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/02/2014