Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/23/2013