Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/18/2013