Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/06/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/16/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/05/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/09/2013