Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/03/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/06/2013