Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/21/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/08/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/14/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 10/23/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/06/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/06/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/06/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/11/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/11/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/14/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/10/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/17/2014