There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission to examine the United States monetary policy, evaluate alternative monetary regimes, and recommend a course for monetary policy going forward.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/14/2013Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/20/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/10/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/09/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/14/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1176. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/2013)

Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2013 - Establishes the Centennial Monetary Commission to: (1) examine how U.S. monetary policy since the creation of the Federal Reserve Board in 1913 has affected the performance of the U.S. economy in terms of output, employment, prices, and financial stability over time; (2) evaluate various operational regimes under which the Board and the Federal Open Market Committee may conduct monetary policy in terms achieving the maximum sustainable level of output and employment and price stability over the long term; and (3) recommend a course for U.S. monetary policy going forward.