Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/10/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/17/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/30/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/24/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/05/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/05/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/28/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/09/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 10/08/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/08/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/03/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/03/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/03/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/03/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/03/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/05/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/07/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/09/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/14/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/04/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/02/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/08/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/13/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/10/2014