Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/04/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/06/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/12/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/13/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/04/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/08/2014