Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/21/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/15/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/20/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 08/02/2013