Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/22/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/06/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/29/2013