Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/06/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 08/02/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/01/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/29/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/14/2014