Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/26/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/27/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/04/2013