Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/10/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/10/2013