There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To grant the Secretary of the Interior permanent authority to authorize States to issue electronic duck stamps, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/18/2014Became Public Law No: 113-239. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014Signed by President.
12/17/2014Presented to President.
12/15/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6840)
04/01/2014Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 113-145.
06/03/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 184).(text: CR H2994-2995)
05/17/2013Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-67.
03/14/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
12/18/2014Became Public Law No: 113-239. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2014Signed by President.
12/17/2014HousePresented to President.
12/16/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6840)
04/01/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343.
04/01/2014SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 113-145.
02/06/2014SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/04/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/03/2013-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/03/2013-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 184). (text: CR H2994-2995)
06/03/2013-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3000-3001)
06/03/2013-5:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/03/2013-5:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1206.
06/03/2013-5:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2994-2996)
06/03/2013-5:03pmHouseMr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/17/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 43.
05/17/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-67.
04/24/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/24/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/24/2013HouseSubcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
03/26/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/14/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/14/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/14/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/14/2013 Referred to
04/24/2013 Markup by
05/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-67
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs03/26/2013 Referred to
04/24/2013 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works06/04/2013 Referred to
02/06/2014 Markup by
04/01/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-145

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.1206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-239 (12/18/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Permanent Electronic Duck Stamp Act of 2013 - Grants the Secretary of the Interior permanent authority to authorize any state to issue electronic duck stamps.

Sets forth state electronic duck stamp application requirements. Allows the Secretary to determine the number of new states permitted per year to participate in the electronic duck stamp program.

Instructs the Secretary to require electronic stamp revenue and customer information collected by each state to be transmitted in accordance with a written agreement between the Secretary and the state.