Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
05/23/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-106.
05/23/2014 Signed by President.
05/22/2014 Presented to President.
05/20/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3192)
05/19/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4451-4452)
03/15/2013 Introduced in House