Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/12/2013