Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/17/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/12/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/20/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/03/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/03/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 12/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/04/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/04/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 12/04/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/05/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 12/10/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/28/2014