Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/20/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 11/19/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/12/2013