Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/20/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 12/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/10/2013