Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/10/2013