Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/04/2013