Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/12/2013