Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/02/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/03/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/05/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 03/25/2014