Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/08/2014