Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/20/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/05/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/10/2013