Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/08/2014