Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/10/2013