Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 04/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/09/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/11/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/17/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/17/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/20/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/27/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/30/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/20/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/02/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/03/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/03/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/04/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/04/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/05/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/10/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 01/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/09/2014