Refine your search

Showing 14 of 14 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
02/26/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
02/25/2014-7:01pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 63). (text: CR H1887-1890)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2014-6:30pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1921-1922)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2014-3:17pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2014-3:03pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1211.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2014-3:03pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1887-1891)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2014-3:03pm House Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H1887)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2013 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-155.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/20/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/20/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
03/15/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/15/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/15/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives