There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FOIA Act
FOIA Oversight and Implementation Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to House

FOIA Act
FOIA Oversight and Implementation Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

FOIA Act
FOIA Oversight and Implementation Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 552 of title 5, United States Code (commonly known as the Freedom of Information Act), to provide for greater public access to information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 63).(text: CR H1887-1890)
07/16/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-155.
03/15/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/26/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
02/25/2014-7:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 63). (text: CR H1887-1890)
02/25/2014-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1921-1922)
02/25/2014-3:17pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/25/2014-3:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1211.
02/25/2014-3:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1887-1891)
02/25/2014-3:03pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H1887)
07/16/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112.
07/16/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-155.
03/20/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/20/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/15/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/15/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/15/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform03/15/2013 Referred to
03/20/2013 Markup by
07/16/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-155
Senate Judiciary02/26/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1211. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/25/2014)

FOIA Oversight and Implementation Act of 2014 or the FOIA ACT - (Sec. 2) Amends the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) to:

  • require federal agencies to make disclosable public records available in an electronic, publicly accessible format;
  • require the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to ensure the existence and operation of a single, free website for submitting requests for records, receiving automated information about the status of a FOIA request, and filing appeals;
  • prohibit an agency from withholding information under FOIA unless such agency reasonably foresees that disclosure would cause specific identifiable harm to an interest protected by an exemption under FOIA or if disclosure is prohibited by law (presumption of openess);
  • expand the functions and reporting requirements of the Office of Government Information Services within the National Archives and Record Administration (NARA);
  • require the Office of Government Information Services to offer mediation services to resolve disputes concerning the disclosure of information under FOIA;
  • expand the rights of individuals making a FOIA request to appeal an adverse determination;
  • require agencies to determine whether the release of agency records would contribute significantly to public understanding of the operations or activities of government;
  • require agencies to document additional search or duplication fees;
  • require agencies to submit annual FOIA reports to the Director of the Office of Government Information Services, in addition to the Attorney General;
  • expand the duties of the Chief FOIA Officer of each agency to require an annual compliance review of FOIA requirements;
  • establish the Chief FOIA Officers Council to develop recommendations for increasing compliance with FOIA requirements; and
  • require each agency to update its FOIA regulations within 180 days of the enactment of this Act.

Requires the Director of the Office of Information Policy of the Department of Justice (DOJ) to submit biennial reports to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform and the Senate Committees on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs and the Judiciary identifying categories of records that would be appropriate for proactive disclosure under FOIA.

(Sec. 3) Requires OMB to establish: (1) a three-year pilot program to review the benefits of a centralized portal to process requests and release information as required by FOIA, and (2) a plan to evaluate the functionality and benefits of such a portal to receive and track FOIA requests by selecting no fewer than three agencies that have not previously participated in such a portal.

Requires the head of each federal agency participating in the pilot program to: (1) report to Congress on the impact of the program on agency processes under FOIA and on whether the agency will continue to participate in the centralized portal, and (2) make such report available in an electronic, publicly accessible format.

(Sec. 4) Requires the Inspector General of each federal agency to: (1) periodically review compliance with FOIA disclosure requirements, including the timely processing of requests, the assessment of fees and fee waivers, and the use of disclosure exemptions; and (2) make recommendations to the head of an agency, including recommendations for disciplinary action. Makes the improper withholding of information under FOIA a basis for disciplinary action.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Archivist of the Untied States to establish an Open Government Advisory Committee as an independent advisory committee to make recommendations for improving government transparency.

(Sec. 6) Prohibits the authorization of additional funds to carry out the requirements of this Act.