Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/17/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/28/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/04/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew