Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/30/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/07/2014