Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/25/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/08/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/14/2014