Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/20/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 12/11/2013