Refine your search

9 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/26/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-187.
11/26/2014 Signed by President.
11/17/2014 Presented to President.
11/12/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7910)
09/10/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5514-5518; text as passed Senate: CR S5514-5518)
07/23/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper with amendments. With written report No. 113-218.
01/14/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 18).(text: CR H202-206)
06/25/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-127.
03/18/2013 Introduced in House