Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/09/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/14/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew