Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/04/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/04/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/18/2013