Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/07/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/08/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/13/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/16/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/28/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/12/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/27/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/13/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/12/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/12/2014