Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/10/2014