Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/08/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/22/2013