Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/04/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 02/10/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/05/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/25/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/15/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/15/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew