Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/14/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/14/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/20/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 07/16/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/18/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/28/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/10/2014