Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/05/2013