Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/21/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/11/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/19/2014