Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/13/2014