Refine your search

16 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
06/10/2013 Senate Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 84.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
06/07/2013 Senate Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
06/04/2013 Senate Received in the Senate.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
06/03/2013-5:03pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-5:03pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2993-2994)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:54pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 126.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:54pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2993-2994)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2013-4:54pm House Mr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 53.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-77.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/24/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/24/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/24/2013 House Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
01/31/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
01/03/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives