Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/19/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/21/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/02/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/11/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/05/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 09/10/2014