Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/20/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/15/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/18/2013