Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/16/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/25/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/08/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/26/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 08/01/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/16/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/16/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/16/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/09/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/21/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/10/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/10/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/31/2014